judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHAMBLIN VS. STATE

Case Information: 33373
Short Caption:CHAMBLIN VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR981284Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/19/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/19/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 98-00124
11/25/1998TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. 09/01/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Corrie L. Wolden. 98-00184
12/03/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Rough Draft Transcript due: 12/8/98. 98-00246
12/08/1998TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 8/31/98 and Sentencing--10/15/98. Court Reporter: Gail West-Willsey. 98-00298
12/18/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 98-00432
12/18/1998AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 98-00435
01/08/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-00113
03/04/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. Judgment: " . . . we vacate the judgemnt of conviction and remand this case to the district court for further proceedings." fn2 [Based on our resolution of the issues discussed above, we need no address appellant's other assignments of error.] SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-01518
03/30/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-02344
03/30/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/06/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 2, 1999. 99-02344