judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN G. JENKINS AND CAROL VOIGT JENKINS, and JOHNSON COUNTY RANCH IMPROVEMENT #1, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company v. GERRY MILLER AND MARIE L. MILLER, Trustees of the Gerry and Marie Miller Living Trust, dated September 27, 2004, and MILLER SAND CREEK RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company

Case Heading (S-07-0216)
Case Number:S-07-0216Case Docketed On:09/14/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Highways (Title 24)
Short Title:JOHN G. JENKINS AND CAROL VOIGT JENKINS, and JOHNSON COUNTY RANCH IMPROVEMENT #1, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company v. GERRY MILLER AND MARIE L. MILLER, Trustees of the Gerry and Marie Miller Living Trust, dated September 27, 2004, and MILLER SAND CREEK RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company
Full Title:JOHN G. JENKINS AND CAROL VOIGT JENKINS, and JOHNSON COUNTY RANCH IMPROVEMENT #1, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company, Appellants (Defendants), v. GERRY MILLER AND MARIE L. MILLER, Trustees of the Gerry and Marie Miller Living Trust, dated September 27, 2004, and MILLER SAND CREEK RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohn G. JenkinsKim D. Cannon
Jon Mark Stewart
AppellantCarol Voigt JenkinsKim D. Cannon
Jon Mark Stewart
AppellantJohnson County Ranch Improvement #1, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability companyKim D. Cannon
Jon Mark Stewart
AppelleeGerry MillerDennis M. Kirven
Benjamin Scott Kirven
AppelleeMarie L. MillerDennis M. Kirven
Benjamin Scott Kirven
AppelleeMiller Sand Creek Ranch, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability companyDennis M. Kirven
Benjamin Scott Kirven

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Easements, Other, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2008 WY 45
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/14/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/14/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/19/2007Correspondence - Incoming - cover letter from Clerk of the District CourtCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
10/24/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/25/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/05/2007Brief - Appellants; appendix to brief of appellants; appellants' statement of costs; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
12/20/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/04/2008Brief - Appellants replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/09/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appelleesNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
01/11/2008Correspondence - Incoming from Counsel for AppelleesCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
01/11/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/17/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/22/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice HillNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
01/22/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice KiteNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgments - oral argument setting - Kim Cannon for appellants; Benjamin Kirven for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/01/2008Order - Assignment of judge - Judge Kautz for Justice Hill.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
02/01/2008Order - Assignment of judge - Judge Donnell for Justice Kite.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
02/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - amended - Dennis M. Kirven instead of Benjamin Kirven on behalf of appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/04/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden and Burke, and District Judges Donnell and Kautz (Kim D. Cannon and Jon Mark Stewart, argument by Mr. Cannon for appellants; Dennis M. Kervin for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/04/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/14/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. District Judge Donnell writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/30/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/02/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal