judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JASON SAUNDERS, ET AL V. INDUSTRIAL BANK, N.A.,

Case Information: 10-CV-1099
Short Caption:JASON SAUNDERS, ET AL V. INDUSTRIAL BANK, N.A.,Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB986-10Filed Date:08/25/2010

Opening Event Date:08/25/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/06/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/21/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeJason Saunders N
Brian P. Murphy NN
Mark G. Griffin NN
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeRegatta LLCN
Mark G. Griffin NN
Brian P. Murphy NN
Appellee-Cross-AppellantIndustrial Bank N.A.N
Richard M. Goldberg NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/25/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/09/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
09/09/2010STATEMENT OF ISSUE(S) (to determine whether appellant has standint to bring an action in the Superior Court) (elp)
09/22/2010 Upon consideration of the notices of appeal filed in these matters, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for these appeals, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CV-1099 and 10-CV-1142 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
09/22/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, if the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
09/30/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (BY: INDUSTRIAL BANK) *************************10CV1099 LW
10/05/2010TMC - appellee's motion to dismiss
10/06/2010RECORD INDEX both cases
10/06/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/01/2010 ORDERED that the MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED AND APPEAL NO 10CV1099 IS HEREBY DISMISSED as the notice of lis pendes was lifted and the property sold to a third party that is not before the court.... It is *****MORE*****
11/01/2010DISMISSED (RZGLNB) (jl)
11/05/2010APPELLANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - vacate or modify dismissal and for leave to file oppo to motion to dismiss
11/09/2010TMC - motion for reconsideration
11/15/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's motion to reconsider, vacate or modify dismissal.
11/17/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for reconsideration and the opposition thereto, it is ORDERED that the MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. (RZGLNB) (jl)
11/17/2010RECEIVED - Appellant's Reply to Appellee's Industrial Bank, NA's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Reconsider, Vacate or Modify Dismissal and for leave to file opposition to motion to dismiss
11/19/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
11/22/2010TMC - appellant's motion for reconsideration - oppo
11/24/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's motion to reconsider
12/06/2010 On consideration of appellants/cross-appellees' motion to reconsider the 11/17/10 order denying their motion for reconsideration of this court's order dismissing APPEAL NO. 10CV1099, the opposition thereto and as the court has previously considered the effect of the notice of lis pendens, it is ORDERED that appellant/cross-appellees' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEES/CROSS-APEPLLANTS' brief in appeal NO 10CV1142 remains due on 12/13/10. (RZGLNB) (jl)
12/21/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived