judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-184
B-184
03/23/1967
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
MELBA JEAN PAGE
HON. CHARLES SHERRILL, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/10/1967Response to Brief filedRespondent
04/26/1967Reply to ResponseRelator
04/20/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
04/20/1967Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondent
03/23/1967Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
03/23/1967Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
03/23/1967Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/13/1967Opinion issued
05/10/1967Response to Brief filed
05/10/1967Affidavit filed
05/10/1967Affidavit filed
05/08/1967Affidavit filed
05/01/1967Affidavit filed
04/26/1967Reply to Response
04/20/1967Response to Petition
04/20/1967Exhibits in case/cause filed
03/23/1967Brief in Support of Petition
03/23/1967Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
03/23/1967Exhibits in case/cause filed
03/23/1967Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. Charles Sherrill, et al.Respondent
Melba Jean PageRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information