judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-182
B-182
03/23/1967
Application for Writ of Error
JIM MORRIS, DBA INDUSTRIAL MACHINERY COMPANY
J.I. CASE CREDIT CORPORATION, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/20/1967Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/20/1967Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/07/1967Response to PetitionPetitioner
04/04/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
03/23/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
03/23/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/04/1967Letter Filed
07/25/1967Response to Motion filed
07/20/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/20/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/07/1967Response to Petition
04/04/1967Response to Petition
03/23/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/23/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/23/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jim Morris, dba Industrial Machinery CompanyPetitioner
J.I. Case Credit Corporation, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information