Case: 01-94-00073-CR
01-94-00073-CR
01/28/1994
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Godoy, John Charles
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/03/1995 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
11/03/1995 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
08/11/1995 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
07/27/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
07/27/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/20/1995 | Submitted | | |
06/20/1995 | Submission | | |
06/20/1995 | Submitted | | |
04/03/1995 | Submission | | |
03/23/1995 | Brief Due | | |
03/20/1995 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
03/20/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/20/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/09/1995 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
02/21/1995 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
02/20/1995 | Brief Due | | |
01/26/1995 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
01/26/1995 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
01/09/1995 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
12/12/1994 | Brief due for retained counsel | | |
11/21/1994 | Brief Due | | |
11/03/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
11/03/1994 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
11/03/1994 | Statement of facts filed | | |
10/25/1994 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
10/21/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
10/14/1994 | Brief due for retained counsel | | |
06/30/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
06/17/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
05/19/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
05/06/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
04/18/1994 | Brief due for retained counsel | | |
02/07/1994 | Transcript filed | | |
01/28/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
01/07/1994 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
12/08/1993 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/03/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Criminal - State of Texas | John B. Holmes |
TEXAS, THE STATE OF | Criminal - State of Texas | Daniel C. McCrory |
State | Criminal - Appellant | Gerald B. Scheve |
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
Honorable ROBERT N. BURDETTE
670,452
life