judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-597
B-597
03/13/1967
Application for Writ of Error
J.A. ROBINSON SONS, INC.
HELEN O. WIGART, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/14/1968Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
07/31/1968Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/12/1968Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/18/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
12/06/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/14/1968Brief in Support of Petition
07/31/1968Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/17/1968Opinion issued
01/12/1968Reply to Response
12/18/1967Response to Petition
12/06/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/06/1967Document received (See Remarks)
03/13/1967Document received (See Remarks)
03/13/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J.A. Robinson Sons, Inc.Petitioner
Helen O. Wigart, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information