judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1997
B-1997
02/19/1970
Application for Writ of Error
OPAL GENTRY
SOUTHERN PACIFIC COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/30/1970Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/09/1970Response to PetitionRespondent
02/20/1970Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/30/1970Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/15/1970Opinion issued
03/18/1970Document received (See Remarks)
03/18/1970Document received (See Remarks)
03/18/1970Document received (See Remarks)
03/18/1970Document received (See Remarks)
03/09/1970Response to Petition
02/20/1970Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/20/1970Document received (See Remarks)
02/19/1970Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Southern Pacific Company, et al.Respondent
Opal GentryPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information