Case: 05-89-00556-CV
05-89-00556-CV
05/15/1989
Automobile Personal Injury
Fryar, Charlie
Rex Bridges and Chris Bridges
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/18/2001 | Order entered | Destroy | |
06/18/2001 | Order Entered | Destroy | |
04/18/2001 | Record Pickup | | |
09/15/1997 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
07/19/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/19/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/02/1990 | Opinion issued | Otherwise Disposed | |
05/02/1990 | Opinion issued | Otherwise Disposed | |
04/18/1990 | Motion to Substitute Attorney Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/17/1990 | Motion to Substitute Attorney | | |
01/31/1990 | Submitted | | |
01/31/1990 | Submission | | |
01/31/1990 | Submission | | |
01/31/1990 | Submitted | | |
12/19/1989 | Letter Filed | | |
12/11/1989 | MattConv | | |
09/28/1989 | Supplemental Transcript filed | | |
09/18/1989 | Mot Ext Time File Strans Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/14/1989 | Response to Motion | | |
09/06/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
09/06/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/06/1989 | Motion to Supplement Record | | |
09/06/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/15/1989 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/11/1989 | Response to Motion | | |
08/07/1989 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
07/17/1989 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
07/13/1989 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
07/12/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
07/05/1989 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/22/1989 | Response to Motion | | |
06/13/1989 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
05/24/1989 | MattConv | | |
05/15/1989 | Transcript Filed | | |
05/15/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/22/1989 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
01/23/1989 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/18/2001 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 5
Dallas
cc87-16113-e