Case Heading (S-07-0237) | |||||
Case Number: | S-07-0237 | Case Docketed On: | 10/16/2007 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | TOBIAS RUSH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | TOBIAS RUSH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Tobias Rush | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson Kirk Allan Morgan Eric M. Alden David E. Westling |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Bruce A. Salzburg Terry L. Armitage D. Michael Pauling James Michael Causey |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
10/16/2007 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
10/16/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
10/16/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
12/04/2007 | Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
12/04/2007 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
12/14/2007 | Brief - Anders; and received copy of brief on disk. | Brief | Anders | Final | |
12/14/2007 | Record - Received unfiled record | Record | Received unfiled record | Final | |
12/14/2007 | Motion - Withdrawal of counsel | Motion | Withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
12/14/2007 | Motion - Extension of time - pro se brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
12/17/2007 | Order - Grant - extension of time to file appellant's pro se brief. | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
12/20/2007 | Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellant regarding filing a pro se brief and the record. | Correspondence | Incoming | Final | |
12/21/2007 | Correspondence - Outgoing - responded to appellant's letter regarding filing of brief and extension of time. | Correspondence | Outgoing | Final | |
01/08/2008 | Order - Deny - Anders brief. Order denying permission for court-appointed counsel to withdraw. | Order | Deny - Anders brief | Final | |
01/25/2008 | Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellant regarding filing a pro se brief. | Correspondence | Incoming | Final | |
01/25/2008 | Correspondence - Outgoing - responded to appellant's inquiry regarding filing a pro se brief. | Correspondence | Outgoing | Final | |
01/31/2008 | Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellant regarding mistaken order granting extension of time to him to file brief. No response. | Correspondence | Incoming | Final | |
02/15/2008 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
02/15/2008 | Motion - Other - permission to file pro se brief. | Motion | Other | Final | |
02/15/2008 | Memorandum - In support of motion to file pro se brief. | Memorandum | In support of motion | Final | |
02/15/2008 | Event - Phone Call - contacted Ms. Kerin regarding attaching proposed pro se brief to the brief of appellant. Requested a correction be filed indicating that appendix B be removed from brief; the pro se brief is submitted and will not be filed until order entered allowing filing of pro se brief. She will submit on 2/19/08. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
02/15/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/15/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for permission to file pro se brief; and received proposed order. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/15/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - Memorandum in support of motion for permission to file pre se brief. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/26/2008 | Response/Objection - Motion to file pro se brief | Response/Objection | Motion | Final | |
02/26/2008 | Motion - Stay briefing - unopposed | Motion | Stay briefing - unopposed | Final | |
02/27/2008 | Motion - Correct a Document - brief of appellant. (Certificate of service mistakenly said 02/26/08, but is 02/27/08 and hand written on hard copies) | Motion | Correct a Document | Final | |
02/28/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - motion to correct brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/28/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received -motion for stay of briefing schedule | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/28/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - Response in opposition to motion for permission to file pro se brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/11/2008 | Order - Denying permission to file pro se brief (and denied motion to stay briefing). | Order | Deny | Final | |
03/24/2008 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
03/25/2008 | Brief - Appellee and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
03/26/2008 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
04/14/2008 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
04/14/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
04/24/2008 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential File | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
08/20/2008 | Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver | Motion | Dismiss - voluntary with waiver | Final | |
08/20/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/20/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal | Notice-Incoming | Waiver of appeal | Final | |
08/20/2008 | Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Order | Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Final | |
08/21/2008 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
08/21/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
08/21/2008 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
08/25/2008 | Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/22/08. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |