judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CABRERA (ROLANDO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33394
Short Caption:CABRERA (ROLANDO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C148196Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/25/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/25/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 98-00174
12/21/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Application for Extension of Time. 98-00460
01/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Court reporter Yvonne Valentin shall file the rough draft transcripts within 5 days of this order or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. Time for filing the fast track statement extended to 20 days of the filing of the transcript. Mailed on: 1/14/99. 99-00095
01/19/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: Uncertified Rough Draft Transcript of Jury Trial, Vols. 1 through 3. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin. Mailed on: 1/14/99. 99-00370
02/02/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-00695
02/10/1999Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 99-00925
02/18/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix received on February 10, 1999. 99-01105
02/18/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-00925
02/18/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-00926
03/01/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-01385
05/13/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-03893
06/08/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-04842
06/08/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/01/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 29, 1999. 99-04842