judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HINGER (RICHARD C.) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33393
Short Caption:HINGER (RICHARD C.) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34781 , 35632 , 44272
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C121163Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/19/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/25/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/25/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00173
12/08/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. District Court Minutes for 11/13/98. Due Date: 10 days
12/31/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of ROA due: 120 days. ROA must include any previously prepared transcripts; ROA shall not include exhibits. 98-00579
01/15/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: 12/17/98. 99-00291
04/19/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 19. 99-03022
04/19/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/09/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Affirmance and Limited Remand to Correct Judgment of Conviction. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of correcting the judgment of conviction as directed above." fn37[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted. We also note that Hinger improperly attempts to raise new factual allegations on appeal, rather than limiting his appeal to questions of law alone.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-13603
09/03/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-13647
09/03/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/24/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 5, 2002. 02-13647