judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JACK DOLLARHIDE v. SCOTT BANCROFT and MURRAY SHATTUCK,

Case Heading (S-07-0236)
Case Number:S-07-0236Case Docketed On:10/15/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:JACK DOLLARHIDE v. SCOTT BANCROFT and MURRAY SHATTUCK,
Full Title:JACK DOLLARHIDE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. SCOTT BANCROFT and MURRAY SHATTUCK, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJack DollarhideRobert E. Schroth Sr.
AppelleeScott BancroftScott P. Klosterman
AppelleeMurray ShattuckScott P. Klosterman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure
Opinion Number:2008 WY 113
Citation:193 P.3d 223

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/15/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/15/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/28/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/28/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/17/2008Event - Phone Call from third party re motion for extension of time to file brief. Unable to fax motion, sent by overnight mailEventPhone CallFinal
01/18/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief - faxed copy - received 01/17/08 but after 5:00 p.m.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/18/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/22/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief - original copy.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/01/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/19/2008Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
03/25/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/07/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/08/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/17/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
09/29/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/15/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/15/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/22/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/17/08 by E. Johnson.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal