Case: 05-87-00582-CV
05-87-00582-CV
05/26/1987
Miscellaneous civil
Busam, Karl & James A. Lamberti
Thomas Tschoepe, Bishop, Roman Catholic Diocese of Dallas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/18/2001 | Order entered | Destroy | |
01/18/2001 | Order Entered | Destroy | |
10/05/2000 | Record Pickup | | |
06/16/2000 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
04/18/1988 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/18/1988 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/17/1988 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
02/17/1988 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
02/01/1988 | Submission | | |
02/01/1988 | Submitted | | |
02/01/1988 | Submission | | |
02/01/1988 | Submitted | | |
01/28/1988 | Motion for Oral Argument Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/27/1988 | Response to Motion | | |
01/15/1988 | Letter Filed | | |
01/11/1988 | MattConv | | |
08/19/1987 | Brief Filed | | |
08/19/1987 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/19/1987 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/11/1987 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/31/1987 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
07/23/1987 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/09/1987 | Brief Filed | | |
07/09/1987 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
06/03/1987 | MattConv | | |
05/26/1987 | Transcript Filed | | |
05/26/1987 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
04/22/1987 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
03/26/1987 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/18/2001 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Glen R. Snyder
CC87-1147-B