Case: 13-20-00137-CR
13-20-00137-CR
03/10/2020
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Melissa Hernandez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/24/2021 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||||||
03/23/2021 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
02/11/2021 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
02/11/2021 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |||||||
02/11/2021 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Grant motion | | ||||||
02/11/2021 | Submitted | | |||||||
09/18/2020 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
09/11/2020 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
08/26/2020 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||||
04/14/2020 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
03/24/2020 | Exhibits filed | | |||||||
03/24/2020 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
03/10/2020 | Trial court certification filed | | |||||||
03/10/2020 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk |
| |||||||
03/09/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
02/12/2020 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/23/2021 | Case Stored | Case stored |
03/23/2046 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Amanda Oster |
Hernandez, Melissa | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Joel H. Thomas |
Trial Court Information
36th District Court
Aransas
Honorable Starr Boldrick Bauer
A-18-5176-CR
Sarah Riemenschneider
2 years TDCJ; $500 fine; $180 restitution