judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-2003
B-2003
02/25/1970
Application for Writ of Error
HOME INDEMNITY COMPANY
BARBARA JUNE MUNCY AND HUSBAND, CHARLES MUNCY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/22/1970Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/15/1970Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/21/1970Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/16/1970Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/11/1970Response to PetitionRespondent
02/25/1970Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/22/1970Response to Brief filed
06/15/1970Brief in Support of Petition
05/26/1970Response to Motion filed
05/21/1970Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/16/1970Reply to Response
03/11/1970Response to Petition
02/28/1970Document received (See Remarks)
02/25/1970Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HOME INDEMNITY COMPANYPetitioner
Barbara June Muncy and husband, Charles MuncyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information