judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1967
B-1967
02/06/1970
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN LUCIUS
TERESA FRANCESCA LUCI CARUSO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/22/1970Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/16/1970Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/23/1970Response to PetitionRespondent
02/06/1970Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/24/1970Response to Motion filed
04/22/1970Reply to Response
04/20/1970Response to Motion filed
04/16/1970Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/23/1970Response to Petition
02/06/1970Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/06/1970Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Teresa Francesca Luci CarusoRespondent
John LuciusPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information