judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

YOUNG (ROGER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38187
Short Caption:YOUNG (ROGER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C166361Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/18/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/18/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-12230
07/18/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/25/00; 6/22/00; 3/12/01 to 3/16/01. Court Reporter: Joseph D'Amato. Filed in district court on: July 13, 2001. 01-12256
07/30/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 06/22/00 and 03/14/01; 03/15/01. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 01-12809
08/21/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-14178
08/31/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: March 12 and 13, 2001. Court Reporter: Joseph D'Amato. 01-14771
09/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court reporter or recorder Joseph D'Amato shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. The motion for an extension of time is granted. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed and served within 30 days of this order. 01-15051
09/25/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Joseph D'Amato requesting extension of time to file transcripts in case nos. 36909/38187/38262/38330/38392 - case are not consolidated. 01-16185
09/28/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On September 25, 2001, court reporter Joseph A. D'Amato filed a letter, which this court elects to construe as a motion for an extension of time to file the requested transcripts in these appeals. The motion is granted. Mr. D'Amato shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file the requested transcripts in these appeals or show cause why Mr. D'Amato should not be sanctioned. No further extensions will be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Nos. 38187/38262/38330/38392-these cases are not consolidated. 01-16353
09/28/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 25, 2001. Court Reporter: Joseph a. D'Amato. 01-16200
10/31/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-18218
11/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 31, 2001. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on October 31, 2001. 01-18504
11/06/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-18220
11/06/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-18221
11/14/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-18949
12/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contention and concluded that it is without merit, we 'ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED.' SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20914
01/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00228
01/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/25/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2002. 02-00228