judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF DAVID J. MONTOYA, AN EMPLOYEE OF KENNECOTT ENERGY COMPANY: DAVID J. MONTOYA v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-07-0203)
Case Number:S-07-0203Case Docketed On:08/28/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF DAVID J. MONTOYA, AN EMPLOYEE OF KENNECOTT ENERGY COMPANY: DAVID J. MONTOYA v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF DAVID J. MONTOYA, AN EMPLOYEE OF KENNECOTT ENERGY COMPANY: DAVID J. MONTOYA, Appellant (Claimant), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid J. MontoyaKenneth Bert DeCock
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionPatrick J. Crank
Michael L. Hubbard
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 32
Citation:203 P.3d 1083

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/28/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/28/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/10/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/10/2007Correspondence - Outgoing - returned copy of designation with note that this pleading is filed in the trial courtCorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
11/27/2007Brief - Failure to file - appelleeBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
11/27/2007Motion - Accept late filing appellee's brief (brief on shelf)MotionAccept late filingFinal
12/05/2007Response/Objection - Motion to file late brief (objection)Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
12/12/2007Order - Deny motion for consideration of appellee's briefOrderDenyFinal
12/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/18/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency RecordRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/19/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/03/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/06/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/11/2009Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
03/11/2009Affidavit - Attorney fees and costsAffidavitAttorney fees and costsFinal
03/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees & Expenses and proposed orderEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/13/2009Response/Objection - CostsResponse/ObjectionCostsFinal
03/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Objection to motion for payment of attorney's fees and expenses.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/24/2009Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
03/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/24/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/24/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/26/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/25/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal