judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDRE ANTOINE FISHER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1077
Short Caption:ANDRE ANTOINE FISHER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-24909-09Filed Date:08/30/2010

Opening Event Date:08/30/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/30/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/06/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAndre A. Fisher Y
Craig N. MooreYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/16/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Craig N. Moore, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
09/16/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Craig N. Moore, Esquire
10/18/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (155 pgs/Walker) 3/23/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (108 pgs/Maddox) 3/24/10 proc. w/cd
12/30/2010RECORD INDEX
12/30/2010RECORD COPIES
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (SEALED pleading)
12/30/2010RECORD COMPLETED
02/16/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (unopposed)
03/17/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 27, 2011. (JAC) '
03/23/2011RECEIVED pro se letter from Appellant regarding lack of assistance and communication from court-appointed counsel.
03/24/2011LETTER referring to counsel for appellant the March 23 pro se letter from appellant. (TN)
06/27/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (unopposed)
07/14/2011FiledOn consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 27, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (pii)
07/27/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/27/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/31/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
09/01/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
12/15/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
12/15/2011FiledAffirmed
01/06/2012FiledMandate