Register of Actions
Case No. J3-EV-23-000531
Hilltop Hospitality LLC vs. Zao Church Inc. dba The Venue at Lake Travis | § § § § § |
|
Related Cases |
---|
C-1-CV-23-002936 (JP Appeal) |
Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Zao Church Inc. dba The Venue at Lake Travis | |||
Spicewood, TX 78669-6580 | ||||
Plaintiff | Hilltop Hospitality LLC | KARA L. OSHAUGHNESSY Retained 512-482-0061 x125(W) | ||
West Lake Hills, TX 78746-2730 |
DISPOSITIONS | |||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/06/2023 | Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: Holmes, Sylvia)
| ||||||||||||||||
OTHER EVENTS AND HEARINGS | |||||||||||||||||
06/21/2023 | Original Petition (OCA) | ||||||||||||||||
06/21/2023 | Petition/Application via E-File | ||||||||||||||||
06/21/2023 | Lease | ||||||||||||||||
06/21/2023 | Notice to Vacate | ||||||||||||||||
06/21/2023 | Citation Requested | ||||||||||||||||
06/22/2023 | Citation Copy Event | ||||||||||||||||
06/22/2023 |
| ||||||||||||||||
06/22/2023 | Email/Mail Received | ||||||||||||||||
06/22/2023 | Comment | ||||||||||||||||
06/22/2023 | Email/Mail Received | ||||||||||||||||
06/26/2023 | Notice | ||||||||||||||||
06/29/2023 | Email/Mail Received | ||||||||||||||||
07/06/2023 | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Holmes, Sylvia) | ||||||||||||||||
07/10/2023 | Request | ||||||||||||||||
07/11/2023 | Appealed Case (JPOCA) | ||||||||||||||||
07/11/2023 | Bond Posted | ||||||||||||||||
07/12/2023 | Letter - No Follow Up | ||||||||||||||||
07/12/2023 | Transferred to County Court | ||||||||||||||||
07/17/2023 | Letter - No Follow Up | ||||||||||||||||
07/17/2023 | Bond Transferred |
Defendant Zao Church Inc. dba The Venue at Lake Travis | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Total Financial Assessment | 64.00 | |||||
Total Payments and Credits | 64.00 | |||||
Balance Due as of 10/10/2023 | 0.00 | |||||
07/11/2023 | Transaction Assessment | 64.00 | ||||
07/11/2023 | Payment | Receipt # 2023-407079 | BRANDON MICHALKE | (64.00) | ||
Plaintiff Hilltop Hospitality LLC | ||||||
Total Financial Assessment | 54.00 | |||||
Total Payments and Credits | 54.00 | |||||
Balance Due as of 10/10/2023 | 0.00 | |||||
06/21/2023 | Transaction Assessment | 54.00 | ||||
06/21/2023 | E-File Electronic Payment | Receipt # 2023-406570 | Hilltop Hospitality LLC | (33.00) | ||
06/21/2023 | State Credit | (21.00) | ||||
Case Number | Style | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
---|---|---|---|
J3-EV-23-000531 | Hilltop Hospitality LLC vs. Zao Church Inc. dba The Venue at Lake Travis | 06/21/2023 Precinct Three | Eviction Appealed |