Case: 14-20-00834-CR
14-20-00834-CR
12/16/2020
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Jeff Robert Pfeifer
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/19/2021 | Response due | | |||
04/01/2021 | Response filed |
| |||
03/29/2021 | Dismissal letter |
| |||
03/25/2021 | Reporters record filed |
| |||
03/05/2021 | Reporters record due | | |||
02/18/2021 | Notice of late record |
| |||
02/08/2021 | Reporters record due | | |||
02/08/2021 | Record due | | |||
02/01/2021 | Clerks record filed |
| |||
12/16/2020 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested |
| |||
12/16/2020 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||
12/10/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||
12/10/2020 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | | |||
10/08/2020 | Trial court certification filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/26/2021 | Status | Appellants brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Pfeifer, Jeff Robert | Criminal - Appellant | Stephen Aslett |
The State of Texas Ex Rel, Travis J. Koehn, Austin County District Attorney | Criminal - State of Texas | Kim K. Ogg Eric Kugler |
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 184th District Court
1639371
Cynthia J. Lee
30 Yrs. TDCJ