judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-96-00534-CR
13-96-00534-CR
10/25/1996
Other Drug Possession
Spears, Randy
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/16/1997Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk
04/11/1997Mandate Issued
02/20/1997Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/20/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
02/19/1997Submitted
02/19/1997Submission
02/12/1997Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/22/1997Letter sent
01/09/1997Brief Filed
01/09/1997Case ready to be set
01/09/1997No oral argument requested
12/10/1996Statement of Facts Filed
12/10/1996Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
12/09/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
12/06/1996Transcript Filed
10/25/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/25/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/10/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Spears, RandyAppellantHon. Keith S. Weiser
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasLorretta Owen
George J. Filley, Iii
Trial Court Information
377th District Court
Victoria
Honorable Robert C Cheshire
93-10-15,470-D
8 yrs TDCJ/$1,000 fine