judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: 96-1028
96-1028
10/25/1996
App Writ of Error
BOX SERVICE COMPANY
KORDULA SCHORER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/18/1996Reply to ResponseRespondent
10/25/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/21/1997Letter FiledLetter from J. Edward Davey stating that no rehearing will be forthcoming, so could we send the record back to the COA ASAP
01/21/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
01/10/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedApplication for writ of error is denied with the notation, "Writ Denied".
11/18/1996Reply to Response
11/13/1996Case forwarded to Court
10/25/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/21/1997Case StoredCase stored.1E4 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SCHORER, JOSEF MICHAELRespondentMr. Russell D. Weaver
AUTO GERMAN IMPORT, INC.RespondentMr. Russell D. Weaver
BOX SERVICE COMPANYPetitionerMr. J. Edward Davey
SCHORER, KORDULARespondentMr. Russell D. Weaver
Court of Appeals Information:
01-95-01369-CV
Rev'd & Rem'd
___ SW2d ___, 06-20-96
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable CAMILLE HUTSON-DUNN
Trial Court Information
County Civil Court at Law No 2
Harris
Honorable Tom Sullivan
633,069