judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-96-00330-CR
09-96-00330-CR
10/25/1996
Theft
Stifflemire, Curtis Ray
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/14/1997MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
04/14/1997Mandate Issued
02/27/1997Order EnteredDismissed
02/18/1997Motion for Dismissal Filed
02/13/1997Order Entered
01/23/1997notification that s/f not filed
11/05/1996Transcript Filed
10/25/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/25/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/14/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasScott W. Rosekrans
Stifflemire, Curtis RayAppellantRichard R. Burroughs
Trial Court Information
County Court
San Jacinto
95-241
$1200 fine