judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: 96-1031
96-1031
10/25/1996
App Writ of Error
ADA MARIE REBSTOCK
RONALD LEE REBSTOCK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/25/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/20/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
02/13/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedApplication for writ of error is denied, with the notation, "Writ Denied".
11/13/1996Case forwarded to Court
10/25/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/20/1997Case StoredCase stored.record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
REBSTOCK, ADA MARIEPetitionerMs. Brenda Brown Rotramble
REBSTOCK, RONALD LEERespondentMr. Robert N. Eames
Court of Appeals Information:
02-95-00273-CV
RULE 90, 07-25-96
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable DIXON W. HOLMAN
Trial Court Information
271st District Court
Wise
Honorable John H. Fostel
91-12-539