judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals

Case: 03-96-00603-CR
03-96-00603-CR
10/25/1996
Other Felony
Donald Ray Caldwell
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/28/1999Case stored
05/27/1998Mandate Issued
02/20/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/02/1998Motion for rehearing filed
01/15/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/06/1997Letter received
11/06/1997Submitted
11/06/1997Submission
10/21/1997Oral argument waiver received
10/20/1997Oral argument acknowledged
10/15/1997Submission
07/01/1997Brief filed
07/01/1997Case ready to be set
06/06/1997Mo. for Ext. filed & disposed ofMotion or Writ Granted
06/02/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/08/1997Brief filed
05/08/1997Mo. for Ext. filed & disposed ofMotion or Writ Granted
05/02/1997Brief received, not filed
05/02/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/11/1997Mo. for Ext. filed & disposed ofMotion or Writ Granted
04/03/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/03/1997Mo. for Ext. filed & disposed ofMotion or Writ Granted
02/27/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/27/1997Exhibits filed
01/27/1997Statement of Facts Filed
01/09/1997Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/06/1997Transcript Filed
01/03/1997Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
11/05/1996Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/31/1996Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
10/29/1996Ext. to file s/facts filed and disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/25/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/27/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasThe Honorable Ken Anderson
Mr. Travis L. McDonald
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
Caldwell, Donald RayAppellantMs. Patricia J. Cummings
Trial Court Information
277th District Court
Williamson
Honorable Johnny William Carter
95-457-K277
2 Cts. LIFE (Prior)