judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-96-00410-CV
08-96-00410-CV
10/25/1996
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Gilbert, Jr., Ray E.
El Paso County Hospital District d/b/a R. E. Thomason General Hospital, et al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/05/1997Mandate Issued
03/05/1997Shuck purged
03/05/1997Mandate Issued
12/19/1996Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/19/1996Opinion issuedDismissed
12/19/1996Opinion issuedDismissed
12/19/1996Submission
12/19/1996Submitted
11/06/1996Miscellaneous filing
11/05/1996Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
10/25/1996Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/25/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/05/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
EL PASO COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRIAppelleeSteven L. Hughes
JONES, FONSECA, IND CAPACITIESAppelleeHon. A Drew Hoffman
JONES, FONSECA, OFC CAPACITIESAppelleeHon. Cheryl L. W. Jackson
Gilbert, Jr., Ray E.AppellantRay E. Gilbert, Jr.
Trial Court Information
171st District Court
El Paso
96-2919