judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHIMES DC INCORPORATED V. REBECCA L. TURNER

Case Information: 10-AA-1076
Short Caption:CHIMES DC INCORPORATED V. REBECCA L. TURNERClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01388-10Filed Date:09/01/2010

Opening Event Date:09/01/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/30/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/06/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/18/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/27/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerChimes DC Inc.N
Charles A. Ray, Jr.YY
RespondentRebecca L. Turner N
John C. KeeneyYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/01/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
09/01/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
09/01/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
09/09/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
11/22/2010APPEARANCE of Jennifer Mezey, Esq. as counsel for the Respondent.
12/30/2010RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcript.
12/30/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
02/16/2011RECEIVED - Petitioner's Brief and Appendix (filed out of time - MOLV needed - voicemail message left for attorney)
02/17/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
03/08/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion for for leave to file the lodged brief and appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that petitioner's motion is granted and the lodged brief and appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
03/08/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
03/08/2011APPENDIX
03/31/2011APPEARANCE- of John C. Keeney, on behalf of respondent
04/06/2011RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
04/06/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/08/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (Jennifer Mezey) Granted
04/20/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
04/22/2011ORD GRT COUNSEL MO TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASON and the appearance of Jennifer Mezey, Esq., is hereby withdrawnas counsel of record. It is F/O that the Clerk shall note that John C. Keeney, Jr., Esq., is the new counsel of record for respondent. (ETW)
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/18/2011FiledArgued Before Glickman,Oberly,Pryor Charles A.Ray Esq.,for appellant John C.Keenney Esq.for appellee
06/04/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
06/27/2012FiledMandate