Case Information: 38186 | |||
Short Caption: | CORTEZ (DANIEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - 014466 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/17/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
07/17/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 01-12167 | |
07/17/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: June 25, 2001. Court Reporter: Lee Bahr. Filed in district court on: July 13, 2001. | 01-12168 | |
07/24/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: June 25, 2001 and July 9, 2001. Courrt Reporter: Randi Lee Walker and Lee M. Bahr. | 01-12563 | |
08/27/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 01-14465 | |
08/27/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 01-14466 | |
09/07/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 01-15135 | |
09/07/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 01-15137 | |
09/27/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 01-16271 | |
10/23/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-16375 | |
10/23/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/01/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 24, 2001. | 01-16375 |