judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID ROY CONINE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0202)
Case Number:S-07-0202Case Docketed On:08/28/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DAVID ROY CONINE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DAVID ROY CONINE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid Roy ConineDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Diane Elizabeth Courselle
John Derek King
Jonah Buckley
Robert Pascoe
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Bruce A. Salzburg
Brandi Lee Monger

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Crimes, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Evidence
Opinion Number:2008 WY 146
Citation:197 P.3d 156

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/28/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/29/2007Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
10/10/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief. Motion to hold appeal in abeyance or in the alternative motion for extension of time to file brief.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/16/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/29/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
11/30/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
11/30/2007Event - Phone Call from Public Defender's Office re Consent of Client form; DAP will send as soon as client completesEventPhone CallFinal
01/10/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/11/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellee; and copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/17/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client - Jonah Buckley and Robert Pascoe, senior law students to appear on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Brandi Monger for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John D. King, Faculty Director and Robert Pascoe, Student Intern for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/29/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/05/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Pre-Sentence Investigation; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/03/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (John D. King, Director, DAP and Robert Pascoe, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Pascoe for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Brandi Lee Monger, Assistant Attorney General, argument by Ms. Monger for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/03/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/12/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/30/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/02/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/31/08 by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal