judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MRS. J. E. RAINS, COUNTY TREASURER OF UPTON COUNTY, TEXAS, ET AL. v. MERCANTILE NATIONAL BANK OF DALLAS, TEXAS

Case: A-268
A-268
07/18/1944
Certified Question from the U. S. Court of Appeals
MRS. J. E. RAINS, COUNTY TREASURER OF UPTON COUNTY, TEXAS, ET AL.
MERCANTILE NATIONAL BANK OF DALLAS, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/06/1944Supplemental Brief filed
10/25/1944Brief on the Merits
10/21/1944Brief on the Merits
07/18/1944Certified Question filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/04/1945Letter Filed
12/19/1944Letter Filed
11/06/1944Supplemental Brief filed
10/25/1944Brief on the Merits
10/21/1944Brief on the Merits
10/10/1944Letter Filed
10/07/1944Letter Filed
10/02/1944Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
07/18/1944Certified Question filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. J. E. Rains, County Treasurer of Upton County, Texas, et al.Appellant
Mercantile National Bank of Dallas, TexasAppellee
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information