judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-96-01303-CR
01-96-01303-CR
10/25/1996
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Grimes, James Maurice
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/13/2017Record Sent
09/25/2017Letter received
06/04/1999Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/04/1999Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/15/1999Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
03/17/1999Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
01/27/1999Case file received by higher Court or agency.
01/26/1999Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
12/01/1998Motion for rehearing was not filed
12/01/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
11/05/1998Extension of time to file PDR disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals.Grant motion
10/01/1998Judgment Issued
10/01/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/01/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/28/1998Submitted
08/28/1998Submission
08/28/1998Submitted
08/05/1998Case set for submission no oral argument
07/30/1998Transcript filed
04/15/1998Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
04/15/1998Case ready to be set
04/15/1998Case ready to be set
04/09/1998Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/24/1998Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/15/1998Brief Due
02/18/1998Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
02/17/1998Brief Due
02/13/1998Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
01/15/1998Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/15/1998Order enteredGrant motion
11/23/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.No action taken on motion
11/17/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/09/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/08/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/08/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/24/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/23/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/21/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/20/1997Brief Due
03/06/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/24/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/23/1997Brief Due
01/16/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/26/1996Brief Due
12/23/1996Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/26/1996Record due
11/26/1996Statement of facts filed
11/22/1996Transcript filed
10/25/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/21/1996Notice of appeal filed
09/27/1996Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/04/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasEric Kugler
GRIMES, JAMES MAURICECriminal - AppellantTerrence A. Gaiser
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
9400486
life