judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-96-01319-CV
14-96-01319-CV
10/25/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Marilyn Atwood
Camden Property Trust D/B/A Cambridge Place Apartments
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/16/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/10/19973rd Notice of Clerk's Record Filing Fee Due
02/04/1997Case stored
01/13/1997Mandate due to be issued
01/13/1997Mandate Issued
01/13/1997Mandate Issued
01/08/19972nd Notice of Clerk's Record Filing Fee Due
01/08/19972nd Notice of Clerk's Record Filing Fee Due
12/12/1996Motion for rehearing DUE
12/12/1996No motion for rehearing FILED
12/05/1996Motion for extension of time to file bondDENIED
12/02/19961st Notice of Clerk's Record Filing Fee Due
11/27/1996Opinion issuedDISMISSED
11/27/1996Opinion issuedDISMISSED
11/26/1996Submitted
11/26/1996Submission
11/26/1996Submitted
11/25/1996Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
11/15/1996Extend time to fild bond FILED - ANT,APE
10/25/1996Transcript received only; mtn. pending
10/25/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/27/1996Bond FILED
07/26/1996Motion for new trial FILED
06/28/1996Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/16/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ATWOOD, MARILYNAppellantAndrew L. Drapkin
CAMDEN PROPERTY TRUST D/B/A CAAppelleeChristopher R Hart
Trial Court Information
55th District Court
Harris
Honorable KATHLEEN S. STONE
94-43242