judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HAGLER (WARREN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38181
Short Caption:HAGLER (WARREN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35994 , 36795 , 37173 , 37240 , 37275 , 37334 , 37628 , 37642 , 37828 , 37829 , 38519 , 38811
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C153186Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12104
08/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Order due from the district court clerk: 30 days. 01-14303
09/04/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: August 9, 2001. 01-14885
09/04/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: August 16, 2001. 01-14906
09/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of (1) Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed on 8/9/01; and (2) Notice of Entry of Order filed on 8/16/01. 01-15641
08/21/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-14264
09/17/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-14831
09/17/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/27/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 19, 2002. 02-14831