Case Heading (S-07-0197) | |||||
Case Number: | S-07-0197 | Case Docketed On: | 08/23/2007 | ||
Linked To: | S-07-0196 | ||||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Second Judicial District Albany County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Corporations, Partnerships and Associations (Title 17) | ||
Short Title: | IN THE MATTER OF KITE RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company: JAMES HEDSTROM and DONNA HEDSTROM, husband and wife, as joint tenants v. POWELL FAMILY OF YAKIMA, LLC, a Washington limited liability company, DOUGLAS BRICKMAN, individually, and DOUGLAS BRICKMAN and ANNE BRICKMAN, husband and wife and as joint tenants | ||||
Full Title: | IN THE MATTER OF KITE RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company: JAMES HEDSTROM and DONNA HEDSTROM, husband and wife, as joint tenants, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. POWELL FAMILY OF YAKIMA, LLC, a Washington limited liability company, DOUGLAS BRICKMAN, individually, and DOUGLAS BRICKMAN and ANNE BRICKMAN, husband and wife and as joint tenants, Appellees (Defendants). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | James Hedstrom | William H. Vines |
Appellant | Donna Hedstrom | William H. Vines |
Appellee | Powell Family of Yakima, LLC a Washington limited liability company | F. Scott Peasley Frank D. Peasley |
Appellee | Douglas Brickman | F. Scott Peasley Frank D. Peasley |
Appellee | Anne Brickman | F. Scott Peasley Frank D. Peasley |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | 2008 WY 39 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
08/23/2007 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
08/23/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
08/23/2007 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
08/23/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
10/08/2007 | Motion - Other - to file consolidated brief of appellants | Motion | Other | Final | |
10/08/2007 | Order - Granting motion for filing of consolidated brief | Order | Grant | Final | |
10/10/2007 | Brief - Appellant - Appellants' consolidated brief; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
11/26/2007 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
11/27/2007 | Motion - Consolidated brief | Motion | Consolidate | Final | |
11/27/2007 | Order - Other granting motion for filing consolidated brief | Order | Other | Final | |
12/07/2007 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
12/12/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/12/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - M. Gregory Weisz for appellants. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
12/19/2007 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three vclumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/19/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
01/07/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Frank Peasley for appellees. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
01/14/2008 | Event - Phone Call - received call from counsel for appellee's office indicating that although Frank Peasley did not sign the brief, he will be arguing the case. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
01/16/2008 | Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Michael (Greg) Weisz for appellants; F. Scott Peasley and Frank Peasley, argument by Frank Peasley for appellees) and taken under advisement. | Event | Oral argument presented | Final | |
01/16/2008 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
04/08/2008 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
04/25/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
04/25/2008 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
04/25/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
04/25/2008 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
04/29/2008 | Service - Certified mail signature return card | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |