judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HARLAN G. HOPKINS V. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION

Case Information: 10-AA-1072
Short Caption:HARLAN G. HOPKINS V. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01044-10Filed Date:08/30/2010

Opening Event Date:08/30/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/26/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/02/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/21/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerHarlan G. Hopkins NPro SeN
RespondentGeneral Services N
R. Craig LawrenceNY
Christina Cotter YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/30/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
08/30/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (Served by DCCA on 8/30/10).
09/10/2010ORDER DENY PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS petitioner is hereby direted to tender the $100 fee within 10 calendar days from the date of this order. Failure to coply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this petition for review. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW)
09/20/2010FILING FEE
10/04/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, and it appearin that petitioner has tendered the $100 fee, it is ORDERED that the lodged petition for review is filed nunc pro tunc to August 30, 2010. It is F/O that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certfied narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16(a)(4). (JAC)
10/04/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & LAWRENCE
12/03/2010APPEARANCE - of Christina Cotter on behalf of respondent
12/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/21/2010RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcripts
12/23/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
02/11/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 23, 2010, directing petitioner to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
02/25/2011RECEIVED - Petitioner's brief and appdx (sent back. MLPB is required)
03/02/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
03/02/2011RECEIVED - petitioner's brief
03/02/2011RECEIVED- appendix
03/07/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
03/07/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion for for leave to file the lodged brief and appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that petitioner's motion is granted and the lodged brief and appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
03/07/2011APPENDIX
03/28/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 4/15/11
04/07/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR STAY (no oppo).
04/18/2011RECEIVED- respondent's brief
04/26/2011ORDER GRANT RESP MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief of respondent. It is (MORE)
04/26/2011ORDER DENYING RESPONDENT MOTION FOR STAY as moot.
04/26/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/05/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/02/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Thompson, Ferren
01/27/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ)
02/21/2012FiledMandate