judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARMAN (FORREST) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38182
Short Caption:HARMAN (FORREST) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010581Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/25/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12147
07/30/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-12779
07/30/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12780
11/15/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 14, 2001. 01-19063
12/17/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 12/13/01. 01-21159
12/17/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-21160
01/16/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 01/15/02. 02-01098
02/13/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Election Not to File a Reply Brief. 02-02880
02/25/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-03447
02/25/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/07/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-04122
04/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-04187
04/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/15/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 5, 2002. 02-04187