judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

D.C. OFFICE OF TAX & REVENUE V. BAE SYSTEMS ENT, SYSTEMS INC

Case Information: 10-AA-1071
Short Caption:D.C. OFFICE OF TAX & REVENUE V. BAE SYSTEMS ENT, SYSTEMS INCClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Tax & Revenue
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:TRC800012-04Filed Date:08/30/2010

Opening Event Date:08/30/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/24/2012
Argued/Submitted:09/19/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/18/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerD.C. Office of of Tax & RevenueN
Todd S. KimNY
Mary L. WilsonYY
Andrew Van Brisker NN
RespondentBAE Systems Enterprise Systems IncorporatedN
Harold Heltzer NN
Robert L. WillmoreYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/30/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (No fee due filed by Tax & Revenue).
08/30/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
09/08/2010 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that BAE Systems Enterprise Systems, Inc. is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 9D.C. 2001); D.C. APP. R. 15 (A)(5). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
10/06/2010APPEARANCE -of Alex E. Sadler on behalf of respondent
10/06/2010APPEARANCE- of Harold J. Heltzer on behalf of respondent
04/08/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcripts
04/08/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
05/18/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF NO OPPO TO 7/25/11
05/27/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before July 25, 2011. (JAC)
07/18/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)
07/26/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File - Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) on or before 8/24/11.
07/29/2011FiledAppearance of Robert L. Willmore on behalf of respondent (Respondent)
08/03/2011FiledLetter From Atty Heltzer stating that Atty Alex Sadler has left the firm and should no longer be listed as counsel. (Respondent) - construed as motion to withdrawGranted
08/17/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (30 days) (Petitioner)Granted
09/01/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief to 9/23/11 (Petitioner)
09/20/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until Ocotber 24, 2011 (Petitioner)Granted
09/27/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until Ocotber 24, 2011 (Petitioner)
10/21/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief so that Parties can continue to discuss Settlement. Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)(No oppo).Granted
11/10/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion to withdraw
11/10/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief so that Parties can continue to discuss Settlement. Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)(No oppo). 11/23/2011
11/21/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief by 30 days (Petitioner)Granted
12/21/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief by 30 days (Petitioner) 12/23/2011
12/23/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
12/23/2011FiledAppendix and statutory addendum (Petitioner)
01/03/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
01/17/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) - 2/24/12
02/24/2012FiledBrief (Respondent) w/ addendum
02/24/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/20/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner)Granted
03/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner) - 5/21/12
05/18/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner)Granted
06/05/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner) - 6/20/12
06/20/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief until August 20,2012 (Petitioner)Granted
06/25/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
06/27/2012FiledOpposition to petitioner's additional extension request (Respondent)
07/03/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/11/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief until August 20,2012 (Petitioner) - 8/20/12
07/17/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Respondent)
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
08/10/2012FiledReply Brief (Petitioner)
09/11/2012FiledLetter From from appellee's attorney stating that Robert L. Willmore will argue the case (Respondent)
09/19/2012FiledArgued Before Judge Oberly,Beckwith,Mcleese, Mary Wilson Esq.,for appellant. Robert L. Willmore Esq.,for appellee.
11/29/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Judge Oberly,Beckwith,Mcleese)
01/18/2013FiledMandate