Case Information: 50664 | |||
Short Caption: | URANGA VS. MONTROY SUPPLY CO. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0700695 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/25/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/10/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/10/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 07-26799 | |
01/23/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-01717 | |
03/12/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | 08-06127 | |
03/27/2008 | Other | Returned Mail. Notice of Modification of Caption 3/12/08 to Roberto "Robert" Uranga. Returned with stamp "Undeliverable Commercial Mail Receiving Agency, No Authorization to Receive Mail for this Addressee". No forwarding address. | 08-07536 | |
03/27/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Attorney James Allison concerning respondent EEOC as a party to this case. | 08-07675 | |
04/25/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to properly serve his notice of appeal on counsel for each of the respondents. Appellant shall also have 20 days from the date of this order to serve his civil proper person appeal statement on James G. Allison and Attorney General Catherine Cortez Masto. fn 2-[ In light of this order, we deny any relief requested in the United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission's March 27, 2008 letter.] | 08-10339 | |
05/06/2008 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed on 4/25/08 addressed to Roberto "Robert" Uranga. Returned with stamp "Undeliverable Commercial Mail Receiving Agency No Authorization to Receive Mail for this Addressee". No forwarding address. | 08-11184 | |
05/15/2008 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Certificate of Service for Notice of Appeal (Allison, AG Masto, Albro). | 08-12247 | |
05/15/2008 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Certificate of Service for Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement (Allison, AG Masto, Albro). | 08-12248 | |
05/27/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Respondents' State of Nevada, Employment Security Division and Nevada Equal Rights Commission Joint Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 08-13298 | |
08/13/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Dismissing Appeal in Part, Directing Transmission of the Record and Directing Remaining Respondents to File a Response. We grant the State of Nevada's motion and dismiss this case as to the State. We conclude that our review of the complete record is warranted. Record in District Court Case No. CV07-00695 due: 30 days. We conclude that a response is warranted. Respondents: shall each have 45 days to file a response. Respondents' responses shall not exceed 10 pages plus the attorney's certificate required by NRAP 28A. The responses need not include the table of contents and table of cases, statutes, and other authorities required by NRAP 28(b). Respondents' responses may cite to either the record on appeal or any appendix filed with the responses. | 08-20873 | |
08/25/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-3. | 08-21922 | |
08/25/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/24/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Affidavit of John F. Suhre pursuant to SCR 43. | 08-24629 | |
09/24/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. EEOC | 08-24630 | |
09/29/2008 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-25157 | |
09/29/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Respondent's Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. | 08-25158 | |
10/10/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Letter from counsel Suhre's office stating that the Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed 9/24/08 was remailed to Appellant Urgana's updated address. | 08-26230 | |
01/09/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We grant the EEOC's motion to dismiss the appeal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-00617 | |
02/03/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-01739 | |
02/03/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/12/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 9, 2009. | 09-01739 |