Case: 14-18-00226-CV
14-18-00226-CV
04/02/2018
Mandamus
In re Turner Jones & Nationwide Coin & Bullion Exchange, Inc.
Yes
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/07/2018 | Appendix filed | Real party in interest |
| ||||||
05/07/2018 | Original Proceeding response filed | Real party in interest |
| ||||||
05/01/2018 | Original Proceeding reply to response filed | Relator |
| ||||||
04/20/2018 | Appendix filed | Relator |
| ||||||
04/13/2018 | Appendix filed | Relator |
| ||||||
04/13/2018 | Original Proceeding reply to response filed | Relator |
| ||||||
04/12/2018 | Original Proceeding response filed | Real party in interest |
| ||||||
04/02/2018 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/27/2018 | Case stored | | |||||||
06/27/2018 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||||
06/27/2018 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||||
06/12/2018 | Memorandum opinion issued | DENIED |
| ||||||
06/12/2018 | Motion to stay disposed | DENIED | | ||||||
06/11/2018 | Submitted | | |||||||
06/11/2018 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
05/07/2018 | Appendix filed |
| |||||||
05/07/2018 | Original Proceeding response filed |
| |||||||
05/07/2018 | Response due | | |||||||
05/01/2018 | Original Proceeding reply to response filed |
| |||||||
04/20/2018 | Response requested by the court |
| |||||||
04/20/2018 | Document filed |
| |||||||
04/20/2018 | Appendix filed |
| |||||||
04/18/2018 | Response due | | |||||||
04/17/2018 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
04/13/2018 | Appendix filed |
| |||||||
04/13/2018 | Original Proceeding reply to response filed |
| |||||||
04/13/2018 | Response due | | |||||||
04/12/2018 | Original Proceeding response filed |
| |||||||
04/10/2018 | Response requested by the court |
| |||||||
04/09/2018 | Motion to stay filed |
| |||||||
04/04/2018 | Response requested by the court |
| |||||||
04/02/2018 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/27/2018 | Case Stored | Case stored |
06/27/2024 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Turner Jones & Nationwide Coin & Bullion Exchange, Inc. | Relator | Bruce C. Tough |
Donald Letbetter D/B/A Howard Printing | Real party in interest | Ryan DeHoyos |
Trial Court Information
189th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 189th District Court
2017-14386