Case Information: 50677 | |||
Short Caption: | FISHER VS. FISHER (CHILD CUSTODY) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D235836 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/11/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Nikki D. Wilson, Ltd. - check no. 3345. | ||
12/11/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Fast Track Child Custody Notice mailed to appellant. | 07-26851 | |
12/11/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Expedited Filing Deadlines. | 07-26854 | |
12/11/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days. | 07-26859 | |
12/26/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 07-27982 | |
12/26/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-27985 | |
12/26/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Docketing Statement. | 07-27986 | |
01/02/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on respondent. | 07-28384 | |
01/02/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/15/07, 09/13/07, 09/17/07, and 10/02/07. To Court Reporter: Domestic Case Court Reporter. Not filed in district court. | 07-28385 | |
01/17/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: January 29, 2008. | 08-01380 | |
01/28/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 8/15/07, 9/13/07, 9/17/07, and 10/02/07. Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. | 08-02175 | |
01/30/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Transcript served on respondent. | 08-02448 | |
01/31/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Transcript served on respondent. | 08-02529 | |
02/04/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-02759 | |
02/04/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols. 1 and 2. | 08-02760 | |
02/11/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Additional court copy. Vols. 1 and 2. | 08-02760 | |
03/28/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Response. Respondent shall have ten days form the date of this order to file her response or otherwise show cause why this appeal should not be decided on the fast track statement, appendix, and filed transcripts. | 08-07713 | |
04/29/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondent's motion is granted in part. Appellant is directed, within five days from the date of this order, to serve respondent at the address on file with this court, a complete copy of the fast track statement's appendix and to provide proof of service to this court within that same time frame. Respondent 20 days from the date indicated on the certificate of service to file and serve her fast track response and any appendix. No further extensions of time will be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Fn1 [We direct the clerk of this court to file respondent's motion for an extension of time, provisionally received in this court on April 7. 2008.] | 08-10615 | |
04/29/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Response | 08-08674 | |
05/08/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Certificate of Service - Appellant's Appendix. | 08-11444 | |
05/27/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-13236 | |
05/27/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 08-13239 | |
07/01/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-16758 | |
07/29/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-18644 | |
07/29/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/07/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 1, 2008. | 08-18644 |