judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6015
B-6015
05/13/1976
MISC PETITION
HARLINGEN HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
JOHN L. HILL, ATTORNEY GENERAL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/24/1976Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/24/1976Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/24/1976Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/24/1976Motion for RehearingRelator
06/21/1976Letter brief Amicus Curiae
05/31/1976Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/13/1976Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/01/1976Response to Motion filed
06/24/1976Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/24/1976Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/24/1976Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/24/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/21/1976Letter brief
05/31/1976Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/24/1976Response to Motion filed
05/13/1976Exhibits in case/cause filed
05/13/1976Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John L. Hill, Attorney GeneralRespondent
Fulbright and JaworskiAmicus Curiae
Texas Medical AssociationAmicus Curiae
Hendrick Memorial HospitalAmicus Curiae
Harlingen Hospital AuthorityRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information