judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-86
B-86
02/06/1967
Application for Writ of Error
GREYHOUND BUS LINES, INC.
KENNETH MITCHELL, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/01/1967Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/20/1967Response to Brief filedRespondent
04/17/1967Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
04/06/1967Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/16/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
02/09/1967Appendix FiledPetitioner
02/06/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/01/1967Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/20/1967Response to Brief filed
04/17/1967Brief in Support of Petition
04/17/1967Response to Motion filed
04/06/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/16/1967Response to Petition
02/09/1967Appendix Filed
02/06/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/06/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kenneth Mitchell, et ux.Respondent
Ferd C. Meyer, Jr.Amicus Curiae
Greyhound Bus Lines, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information