judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-103
B-103
02/13/1967
Application for Writ of Error
SUPERIOR OIL COMPANY
MAGNOLIA I.S.D., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/03/1967Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/06/1967Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/27/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
02/13/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/05/1967Response to Motion filed
05/03/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/06/1967Reply to Response
02/27/1967Response to Petition
02/13/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/13/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SUPERIOR OIL COMPANYPetitioner
Magnolia I.S.D., et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information