judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-110
B-110
02/14/1967
Application for Writ of Error
GULF STATES UTILITIES COMPANY
TEXAS EMPLOYMENT COMMISSION, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/13/1967Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/16/1967Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/10/1967Response to PetitionAmicus Curiae
03/07/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
02/14/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/13/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/16/1967Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/10/1967Response to Petition
03/07/1967Response to Petition
02/14/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/14/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Employment Commission, et al.Respondent
GULF STATES UTILITIES COMPANYPetitioner
Texas Manufactures AssociationAmicus Curiae
Texas AFL-CIOAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information