judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILSON (ALLEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33374
Short Caption:WILSON (ALLEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C34475Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/24/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00125
12/11/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of ROA due: 120 days. ROA must include any previously prepared transcripts; ROA shall not include exhibits. 98-00346
12/21/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from entered in district court on: 11/17/98. 98-00470
12/22/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Letter to proper person appellant Wilson returning copies of various documents filed in district court. 98-00481
03/24/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. Mailed on: 3/22/99. 99-02122
03/24/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/18/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11476
12/14/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-12584
12/14/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/03/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 20, 1999. 99-12584