judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE AND GUARDIANSHIP OF TJM: DELORES HOPE MASCARENAS v. ONIKA PEPERGIAS

Case Heading (S-07-0217)
Case Number:S-07-0217Case Docketed On:09/17/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE AND GUARDIANSHIP OF TJM: DELORES HOPE MASCARENAS v. ONIKA PEPERGIAS
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE AND GUARDIANSHIP OF TJM: DELORES HOPE MASCARENAS, Appellant (Petitioner), v. ONIKA PEPERGIAS, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDelores Hope MascarenasKelly Marie Neville
AppelleeOnika PepergiasDina M. Christiansen
Other Particpants
Guardian ad litemRaymond D. MacchiaRaymond D. Macchia

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/17/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/17/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/17/2007Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
09/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/19/2007Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
09/25/2007Motion - Stay - other -briefingMotionStay - otherFinal
10/23/2007Order - Denying motion to stay briefing.OrderDenyFinal
10/30/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
10/30/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/30/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal