judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-87
B-87
02/06/1967
Application for Writ of Error
O. P. LEONARD
TEXACO, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/29/1967Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/17/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
02/06/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/04/1967Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
07/05/1967Response to Motion filed
06/29/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/14/1967Opinion issued
04/05/1967Document received (See Remarks)
02/17/1967Response to Petition
02/06/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/06/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
O. P. LeonardPetitioner
Texaco, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information