judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

EDNA G. NOVY v. JIM NOVY, ELLIS, FRIEDEN, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA F AND R OIL COMPANY

Case: A-2850
A-2850
08/14/1950
Application for Writ of Error
EDNA G. NOVY
JIM NOVY, ELLIS, FRIEDEN, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA F AND R OIL COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/09/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/25/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
08/22/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
08/14/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/10/1950Response to Motion filed
11/09/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/25/1950Response to Petition
08/22/1950Response to Petition
08/14/1950Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/14/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ellis, Frieden, individually and dba F and R Oil CompanyRespondent
Edna G. NovyPetitioner
Jim NovyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information